MOVE THE MASSES

Charity number: 1179679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barbara Willett Trustee 02 August 2020 None on record
Deborah Rack Trustee 24 March 2019 None on record
John Bourton Trustee 01 July 2018
FRIENDS CENTRAL ADULT SCHOOL AND COTTAGE (IN CONNECTION WITH YORK PREPARATIVE MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS) Received: On time
Jack Strickland Trustee 05 May 2021 None on record
NICK GRIFFIN Chair 01 July 2018 None on record
Phil Tonks Trustee 07 June 2020 None on record