Accounts and annual returns A DOG'S TALE

Charity number: 1178178
Charity reporting is overdue by 1178 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 448 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 448 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 813 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 813 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1178 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1178 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 February 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 February 2020 11 days late Download Open in new window