DEXTERS ODYSSEY

Charity Number: 1178623
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our aim is simple, to help families spend more time together & relieve parents of the additional, as well as unexpected financial challenge of their child going through treatment. Partnering with Bristol Royal Hospital for Children, we provide parents with 4 offerings whilst their child receives treatment; *Coffee Break & Cake *Dexters Hamper *Odyssey Entertainment Package *Help Out Vouchers

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023

Total income: £7,702
Total expenditure: £10,743

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 2018: CIO registration
  • 19 October 2020: Funds received from 1179419 KAYLUMS KISSES
  • 23 May 2022: Funds received from 1164367 STACEY'S SMILES
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW PHILIP LIEBOW Chair 04 June 2018
None on record
Myles Dorian Horton Trustee 16 March 2019
None on record
Chris Adam Sweeting Trustee 16 March 2019
None on record
Faye Bridget Perry Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
LUCY ELLEN LIEBOW Trustee 04 June 2018
None on record
Leila Jayne Morrill Horton Trustee 04 June 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £37.27k £45.73k £6.65k £36.42k £7.70k
Total expenditure £18.56k £20.33k £13.50k £12.57k £10.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 15 July 2024 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 15 July 2024 76 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 21 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Esson Road
BRISTOL
BS15 1NP
Phone:
07563398670