LONDON THUNDER BASKETBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1183865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide activities which benefit the community and in particular to provide diversionary activities for disadvantaged young people living in the inner city of London. The company aims to reach those young people who do not normally have access to high quality coaching programmes. Young people will benefit from positive role models and the opportunity

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £229,778
Total expenditure: £224,144

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley
  • Croydon
  • Lewisham
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 June 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Clark Trustee 21 February 2025
None on record
Angela Loum Trustee 21 February 2025
None on record
Dejan Paunovic Trustee 25 March 2022
None on record
ADELAINE NIETZOLD Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record
PETER MARK BISHAI BSC MSB Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record
Steven Bucknall Trustee 13 June 2019
New Bermondsey Sports Foundation Limited
Received: On time
PETER LANG Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record
NIKKI SEALY B.ED, M.A. Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £118.91k £338.41k £200.87k £252.55k £229.78k
Total expenditure £92.69k £287.56k £178.59k £182.59k £224.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 16 August 2024 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 16 August 2024 77 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 28 August 2023 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 28 August 2023 89 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 22 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 05 April 2022 309 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 05 April 2022 309 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Thunderdome
Unit 2
Stockholm Road
LONDON
SE16 3LP
Phone:
07581011571
Website:

thunderbasketball.net