Accounts and annual returns LEEDS MODEL RAILWAY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1178071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On time
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window