Accounts and annual returns ADA & ALBERT

Charity number: 1178629
Charity reporting is overdue by 178 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 178 days
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 178 days
Annual return 27 February 2022 09 March 2023 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2022 09 March 2023 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 February 2021 20 January 2022 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2021 21 January 2022 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 February 2020 26 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2020 26 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 27 February 2019 07 May 2020 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2019 09 June 2020 165 days late Download Open in new window