Trustees HIGHFIELDS CHURCH
Charity number: 1179013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Chen Ng | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Gooderham | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Nigel Graham | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MARK POPHAM | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Anthony John Williams | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Bhakia Raj | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Evans | Trustee | 25 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jason Stuart Phillips | Trustee | 25 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rowland Hughes | Trustee | 25 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev JONATHAN DAVID REEVES | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev MICHAEL LEWIS TEUTSCH | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW REES | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID MARTYN GOBBETT | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY CRESSWELL | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.