ONE COMMUNITY LINK

Charity number: 1178936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download