WOOLTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We stage fun activities for families at our school such as school fairs. We provide funds to Woolton Primary School to support extracurricular activities and events such as cinema trips and circus visits. We perform fundraising activities at school fairs, through raffles and other ad-hoc events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 29 June 2018: Standard registration
- WOOLTON PFA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURA DAVIS | Chair | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Ashton | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE TAYLOR | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Sloane | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE WASLEY | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.23k | £5.32k | £36 | £1.12k | £13.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.81k | £6.14k | £1.11k | £2.45k | £9.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 August 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOOLTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PFA
OUT LANE
LIVERPOOL
L25 5NN
L25 5NN
- Phone:
- 01514283235
- Email:
- wooltonprimarypfa@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window