THE FRIENDS OF AVONMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Avonmouth is a Parent, Teacher and Friends charity which raises funds for the benefit of pupils at Avonmouth CE Primary School. They do this by arranging school fairs, recycling clothes, batteries and ink cartridges, amongst many other activities. Events are held within the school premises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
Governance
- 27 June 2018: Standard registration
- PTFA (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Clare Dimambro | Chair | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rebecca Lock | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
KIM ANN O'CONNOR | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
TRUDI ANNETTE WEBB | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06k | £964 | £3.43k | £29.95k | £87 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.90k | £2.11k | £444 | £23.12k | £2.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Avonmouth C of E School
Catherine Street
Avonmouth
BRISTOL
BS11 9LG
- Phone:
- 01179030280
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window