WARMING UP THE HOMELESS

Charity number: 1180417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JULIAN WOOTTEN Trustee 11 October 2020
CHARITY FOR KIDS Received: On time
Steven Michael Wallis Chair 04 December 2019 None on record
SCOTT O'ROURKE Trustee 20 February 2017 None on record
Memish Huseyin Trustee 02 June 2021 None on record
EMILY FLANAGAN Trustee 20 May 2018 None on record
Trudy Alison Hampton Trustee 31 May 2018
COMMUNITY SUPPORTERS Recently registered