Financial history PADGATE YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 512230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.15k £11.36k £9.85k £0 £0
Total expenditure £10.83k £9.24k £4.95k £400 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A