SAAVAN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is to advance the education of impoverished children in less privileged parts of the world by partnering with proven charities to build schools and youth centres in areas that need it most.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Cambodia
- India
Governance
- 10 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUSH MUNDAE | Chair | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simran Kaur Mundae | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HEATH | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JAMES REES | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAYMINI MUNDAE | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JO HEATH | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JASPREET KAUR MUNDAE | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
FRANCESCA MARIE BAYLISS | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONNY STEWART | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.17k | £3.32k | £28.77k | £147.75k | £7.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.07k | £2.37k | £4.09k | £188.14k | £670 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jan 2019 as amended on 08 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF IMPOVERISHED CHILDREN IN DISADVANTAGED AREAS OF THE WORLD WHO HAVE NO ACCESS TO SCHOOLS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO PARTNERING CHARITIES TO BUILD SCHOOLS AND YOUTH CENTRES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O BULLETPROOF DESIGN LTD
10 BEDFORD STREET
LONDON
WC2E 9HE
- Phone:
- 02073953636
- Email:
- info@saavanstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window