WIRRAL GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS,AFFILIATED TO THE INSTITUTE OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS LTD

Charity number: 512232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required