WIRRAL GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS,AFFILIATED TO THE INSTITUTE OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS LTD

Charity number: 512232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIZABETH SCARFF Trustee None on record
SHEILA ROSE Trustee None on record
MR TONY STOPFORTH Chair None on record
AMANDA JANE WILLIAMS Trustee 10 February 2020 None on record
DR Guy Lightfoot Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
SIMON MARK RICHARDS Trustee 03 August 2015 None on record
Joanne Bolland Trustee 10 September 2018 None on record
YVONNE CHARLETT Trustee 12 March 2018 None on record
DYSON INNES BROWN Trustee 08 August 1991 None on record