CHINESE COMMUNITY WELLBEING SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve hardship and distress by providing assistance, advice and services amongst the Chinese community To provide or assist in the provision of recreation for people and their families with a view to improving their conditions of life The advancement of education between the Chinese community and the local community through educational, cultural and social activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£503,641
Donations and legacies | £2.03k | |
Charitable activities | £492.90k | |
Other trading activities | £2.82k | |
Investments | £5.89k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£415,315
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £415.32k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £171,703 from 3 government contract(s) and £46,225 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £415.32k | |
Retained for future use | £88.33k |
People

16 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 25 January 2019: CIO registration
- 14 February 2023: Funds received from 1079401 BRISTOL AND AVON CHINESE WOMEN'S GROUP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Zheng Feei Ma | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Royston Griffey | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Sunny Chan | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Siu Kuen Ting | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yee Kiu Wan | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Fung-Ming Choi | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Po Lin Ho | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
POH HOOI TEOH | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
YEE KWAN LO | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £494.50k | £282.33k | £503.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £253.12k | £352.74k | £415.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £263.09k | £207.76k | £171.70k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £59.07k | £34.69k | £46.23k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.03k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.82k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £492.90k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.89k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £415.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £572.07k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £56.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE, ADVICE, REPRESENTATION AND SERVICES AMONGST THE CHINESE COMMUNITY. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES OR FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BETWEEN THE CHINESE COMMUNITY AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY THROUGH EDUCATIONAL, CULTURAL AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chinese Community Wellbeing Society
The Vassall Centre
Gill Avenue
BRISTOL
BS16 2QQ
- Phone:
- 01179351462
- Email:
- admin@chinesecws.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window