Accounts and annual returns THE MASS OBSERVATION ARCHIVE

Charity number: 1179673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 14 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 14 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 09 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 09 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 02 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window