Accounts and annual returns THE MAYOR OF WOLVERHAMPTON'S CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1180065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 03 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 11 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2021 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 February 2021 371 days late