THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD COVENANT RESTORATION ASSEMBLY SHELDON BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith worldwide in accordance with the doctrines set out in the Statement of Faith schedule of the Charity Trust Deed and the relief of poverty. The Charity also engages in youth and community development activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 16 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLUWATOSIN SOETAN | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|||||
MOBOLAJI ANISHERE | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Benjamin Sholademi | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.66k | £7.58k | £8.98k | £18.72k | £39.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.65k | £5.69k | £6.58k | £9.52k | £21.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 14 December 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
6.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") WHICH IS TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Amble Close
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B74 2FP
- Phone:
- 07908371927
- Email:
- rccg.sheldon@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.RCCGCRA-SHELDON.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window