THE HEAVENLY MISSION (THM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(THM) is very active within the space and place of providing innovative methods of youth engagement that give young people the opportunity to be involved in their community. The alternatives are activities that give youths chances to turn away from antisocial behaviour. We encourage youths to uphold good values and principles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Southwark
Governance
- 26 July 2018: CIO registration
- HEAVENLY MISSION (Working name)
- HM PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
simon zolana | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Benedicte Muanga Konga | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
YOLIE - DAFROSE SAKU | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.99k | £12.23k | £13.64k | £2.40k | £2.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.97k | £7.84k | £18.52k | £2.31k | £2.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 39
Braham House
Vauxhall Street
London
SE11 5LD
- Phone:
- 07590204095
- Email:
- simonz@thmproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window