Accounts and annual returns KICKSTARTED

Charity number: 1183283
Charity reporting is up to date (162 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 April 2022 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 April 2022 162 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window