Trustees FLEETWOOD TRUST
Charity number: 1181679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Thomas McNally | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Barnes | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Joseph Fitzgerald | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Spencer | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Linda Burns OBE | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Murdoch | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Canon Alfred Terence Hayes | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Olsen | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
FRANK IDDON HEALD | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|||||
ANDREW DAVID CHARLES | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.