Accounts and annual returns 1ST THRINGSTONE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 512312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 18 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 03 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 05 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 09 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required