RAQUEL'S WISHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide and maintain rescue homes for Bichon Frise and Bichon Frise cross dogs in need of care and attention in England and Wales and also support these animals and their forever families during the re-homing process. We are totally volunteer run and rely on donations to sustain
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LISA CARON WALKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KEITH JOHN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ANN JOHN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1206 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1571 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE WIDER PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF BICHON FRISE AND BICHON FRISE CROSS DOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES AND REHOMING SUPPORT FOR SUCH ANIMALS IN ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 WEST VIEW CLOSE
EAGLESCLIFFE
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS16 0DS
- Phone:
- 07568549816
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window