Trustees THE OAKLANDS

Charity number: 512326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN LUNN Chair
None on record
Carole Elizabeth Graham Trustee 23 October 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Jane Cannings Trustee 23 October 2023
None on record
Claire Poole Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Elaine Hopkins Trustee 28 September 2020
None on record
Geoff Milnes Trustee 15 January 2018
None on record
Margaret Shooter Trustee 24 January 2014
None on record
BRENDA STOCKDALE Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH NUTTALL Trustee
None on record
Dr PETER BIRCHENALL Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT PETER & SAINT PAUL, WARSOP WITH SAINT AUGUSTINE SOOKHOLME
Received: On time