Accounts and annual returns THE PERSHORE AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required