THE WOLVERHAMPTON INTEGRATED RESPIRATORY LIFESTYLE (TWIRL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly Group at Goodyears Pavilion, Wolverhampton Lunch & refreshments Social activities provided are bingo, quizzes, educational talks,cards and dominoes. These activities encourage members to mix and make new friends. The opportunity to seek advice and support on how to cope with the effects of respiratory diseases from a variety of healthcare professional
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 15 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENISE MARGARET PRITCHARD | Chair | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Davies | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
SHARON NISBET | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN PARKES | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARIE WARD | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.43k | £0 | £3.34k | £8.71k | £9.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.17k | £432 | £4.25k | £7.69k | £10.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH RESPIRATORY CONDITIONS AND THEIR CARERS WITHIN THE CITY OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 PENSHAW CLOSE
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV9 5NE
- Phone:
- 07887795131
- Email:
- sharon.nisbet18@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window