Trustees THE CO-OPERATIVE HERITAGE TRUST
Charity number: 1179727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Webster | Chair | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandra Zenia Mitchell | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Stephen J Milner | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Dalton | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
John William Boyle | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Jardine | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Ian Adderley | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Alessandro Gennaro Bucci | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Noon | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD POWELL | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.