Trustees THE ECCLESIASTICAL LAW SOCIETY

Charity number: 1181002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Wilson Chair 05 December 2018
TARIRO - HOPE FOR YOUTH IN ZIMBABWE
Received: On time
The Right Reverend Dr Martin Clive Warner Trustee 02 April 2022
THE SOCIETY OF ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE
Received: On time
THE JOHN BOOTH CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MOTHER AGNES TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN FUND AND BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
BISHOP OTTER TRUST
Received: On time
The Venerable Moira Anne Elizabeth Astin Trustee 02 April 2022
REGINALD BAKER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
COLLEGE OF ST BARNABAS
Overdue by 92 days
SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN WELCARE
Received: On time
SPARKFISH
Received: On time
Edward William Dobson Trustee 20 March 2021
SOCIETY FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FAITH
Received: On time
Lee Coley Trustee 20 March 2021
None on record
Samuel Robert Henry Maginnis Trustee 20 March 2021
None on record
Revd Neil Sydney Patterson Trustee 20 March 2021
None on record
Rev Stephen Paul Losack Coleman Trustee 25 November 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, GRANGE PARK
Received: 128 days late
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SCHOOLS
Received: On time
Anne-Marie Claire Organ Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record
Rev Christopher Matthew Smith Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record
Paul Edward Stephen Barber Trustee 05 December 2018
COUNCIL OF CHURCH UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES
Received: On time
EDMUND PLOWDEN TRUST
Received: On time
FORMATIO
Received: On time
Frances Mary Godden Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record
The Revd Paul John Benfield Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record
RUTH MARIAN ARLOW Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record