OSMINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OVH provides facilities for a wide range of leisure, recreational activities and social events, providing community space especially for all Parishioners and members of public. The Trustees will ensure the hall evolves to meet the needs of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 October 2018: CIO registration
- 07 April 2021: Funds received from 301159 OSMINGTON VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTOR GRAHAM WHITE | Chair | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Reed | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Squibb | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Clarke | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Parker | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lock | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey John Little OBE | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ESTHER SQUIBB | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
THERESA CHRISTINE HARDY | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN JANE BRAMLEY | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.24k | £5.15k | £15.01k | £22.73k | £14.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.01k | £12.29k | £11.68k | £14.62k | £16.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.60k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF OSMINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE OF: (A)MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND (B)OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; AND (C)HIRE FOR PRIVATE USE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old School
Osmington
Weymouth
DT3 6EX
- Phone:
- 07966381804
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window