FRIENDS OF BRITISH SOUTHERN CAMEROONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FBSC operates for general charitable purposes; covering disability, prevention or relief of poverty and upholding human rights/religious or racial harmony/equality or diversity by providing grants to individuals, organisations and other finances in the area of British Southern Cameroons and Nigeria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Cameroon
- Nigeria
Governance
- 29 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIANTA NJOMIA | Chair | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ogunbowale | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Seamus O'Looskan | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
GERALDINE CARPENTER | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £525 | £948 | £9.45k | £3.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £482 | £1.35k | £8.12k | £4.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 May 2023 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 May 2023 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE SOUTHERN CAMEROONS BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 2
1 Barradale Court
LEICESTER
LE2 1AN
- Phone:
- 07861708149
- Email:
- friendsofBSC@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window