GEEK.ZONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running events in the community to promote social inclusion and mental well being by giving members a like minded social network to become part of. Including but not limited to board gaming, LAN Parties, Coding Education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 February 2019: CIO registration
- GZ (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Douglas Geddes FRSA FMHC | Chair | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Rees | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Isobel Geddes | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Wadland | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.63k | £1.14k | £13.41k | £2.77k | £1.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.55k | £2.91k | £2.27k | £2.03k | £2.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY EXCLUDED ON GROUNDS OF MENTAL ILL-HEALTH, WHO EXPERIENCE HIGH LEVELS OF SOCIAL ANXIETY AND DIFFICULTIES WITH SOCIAL INTERACTION, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, GUIDANCE, SUPPORT AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, INCLUDING ACCESS TO EMPLOYMENT, AS A RESULT OF DISABILITY OR MENTAL ILL-HEALTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Union House
111 New Union Street
Coventry
CV1 2NT
- Phone:
- 0 3000 3000 30
- Email:
- hq@geek.zone
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window