ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH ST MARY OF DEBRE TSION, LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a Church of the Ethiopian Orthodox Tewahedo Church, St Mary of Debre Tsion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 November 2018: CIO registration
- REESE ADBARAT ST. MARY OF DEBRE TSION ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH, LONDON (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dereje Moges Debella | Chair | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
L/Deacon Mahader Kassa | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Girma Hailemariam Hailu | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mechale | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Felekech Alemu | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gezachew Gebremichael | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Engedawork Geberegziabher Woldetsadik | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Layikun Berhanu Bisrat | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sosena Assefa | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £95.91k | £159.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £32.96k | £74.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 December 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 December 2021 | 426 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 January 2022 | 445 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH (THE ÔOBJECTSÖ) ARE: 3.1. TO PROPAGATE THE GOSPEL OF CHRIST BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND REGULATIONS OF THE ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH; AND 3.2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE PARISH ADMINISTRATIVE COUNCIL MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 ST. PHILIP SQUARE
QUEENSTOWN ROAD
LONDON
SW8 3RT
- Phone:
- 07421005824
- Email:
- info@debretsionlondon.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window