Financial history MONTGOMERYSHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 512390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £506.20k £529.16k £593.38k £1.37m £867.25k
Total expenditure £486.70k £558.76k £542.22k £589.47k £594.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £24.55k £109.11k £136.42k £220.40k £147.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £195.18k £197.92k £246.65k £233.81k £179.23k
Income - Other trading activities £55.09k £47.00k £53.25k £62.28k £57.89k
Income - Charitable activities £255.93k £284.24k £293.49k £1.07m £630.13k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £10.00k £4.78k £1.50k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £461.30k £543.70k £525.18k £571.79k £568.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.69k £6.03k £5.51k £4.89k £5.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £25.40k £15.05k £17.05k £17.68k £26.04k