LEASIDE CHURCH WARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leaside is an open, welcoming church, seeking to live out Christian discipleship in worship and mission, providing: public worship, open to all; a home for community groups; pastoral care as needs are known; active support for initiatives eg Street Pastors; weekly community drop-in, including bereavement support; welcoming especially the elderly and those with special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £1,122 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 December 2018: Standard registration
- LEASIDE CHURCH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ernest Geoffrey Bosse | Chair | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ann Edwards | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Mary Paris Pickering | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Davis | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ROGER WATSON | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Julia Mary Gristwood | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Anne Stockdale | Trustee | 04 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tony Gubb | Trustee | 05 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Janice Cooper | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Stephen John Brazier | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.86k | £58.15k | £231.78k | £353.43k | £106.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.15k | £69.68k | £58.30k | £93.76k | £94.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | £1.90k | £425 | £1.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 April 2021 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 April 2021 | 295 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOV 2010
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES. IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CHARITY WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A) THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; B) THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C) MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D) PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; E) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; AND F) THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leaside Church
Leaside Walk East Street
WARE
SG12 9BT
- Phone:
- 01992423807
- Email:
- admin@leasidechurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window