CHELTENHAM TOWN COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity set up to benefit the people of Gloucestershire by providing and assisting with sports participation; physical and mental health and well being; education; and social welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 05 October 2018: CIO registration
- 17 November 2022: Funds received from 1124119 CHELTENHAM TOWN COMMUNITY EDUCATION AND SPORTING T...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULA LESLEY BALDWIN | Chair | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Howard Jubb | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Mark Edmundson | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|||||
James Fleming | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shona Arora | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Craig Spencer Bloxham | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SMITH | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ROBERT GODFREY | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PATRICK MURPHY | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £308.78k | £283.89k | £316.87k | £301.45k | £354.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.16k | £300.28k | £270.87k | £287.62k | £352.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £8.10k | £24.29k | £16.04k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £71.61k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 September 2021 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 September 2021 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 September 2021 | 437 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 September 2021 | 437 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES TO PLAY SPORT WHATEVER THEIR ABILITY OR BACKGROUND. TO ASSIST AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR PEOPLE TO BE PHYSICALLY ACTIVE AND TO LEAD HEALTHIER LIFESTYLES. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING THROUGH HEALTHY RECREATION. TO ADVANCE AND ASSIST IN ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHELTENHAM TOWN FOOTBALL CLUB
WHADDON ROAD
CHELTENHAM
GL52 5NA
- Phone:
- 01242518630
- Email:
- info@ctfccp.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window