Accounts and annual returns BADGE OF MANY COLOURS

Charity number: 1179836
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 June 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 13 June 2022 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 17 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 07 August 2020 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 07 August 2020 68 days late Download Open in new window