THE WHISTLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money to facilitate the advancement of education (in young people and adults) around the issues of 'equality, diversity & inclusion', whilst also advancing amateur sport around the same areas (and for the same population), focusing on the 9 protected characteristics
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAKTI AJAY SHARMA | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Greg Rollason | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CHRISTOPHER LUNN | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.75k | £5.02k | £11.85k | £11.60k | £25.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.55k | £2.62k | £13.04k | £10.40k | £23.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 January 2022 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 January 2022 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 December 2020 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 December 2020 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jul 2018 as amended on 07 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE: • CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. • VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Highcroft Avenue
STOURBRIDGE
West Midlands
DY8 5LX
- Phone:
- 07870207757
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window