THE ROMANI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates from my office/home. Myself, my assistant, my sister, daughter and secretary are all involved although myself and my assistant are the main persons involved. Hopefully as time goes on we may get other volunteers to assist. We will raise funds through fundraising, donations and events, I will also donate monies from my company and personally to get us started! I have done
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 08 January 2019: CIO registration
- JORDAN'S FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Harwood | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHLOE JADE ARNOLD | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ROMANI | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNA ROMANI | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.99k | £11.78k | £11.37k | £10.51k | £9.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.46k | £19.85k | £17.93k | £8.03k | £9.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CIO ARE: THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF YOUNG PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DEPRESSION, SOCIAL ISOLATION, ANXIETY, PANIC ATTACKS OR DRUG ADDICTION BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INTERVENTION AND OF DIRECT AND INDIRECT COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS BY:- A) CREATING A NETWORK WITH OTHER CHARITIES AND NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS THAT IS SUSTAINABLE AND ADDRESSES THE PERCEPTION OF MENTAL HEALTH AS A STIGMA AND TO WHICH WE CAN SIGNPOST RELEVANT CANDIDATES FOR HELP. B) CAMPAIGNING TO (I) CATEGORISE SUCH ISSUES AS ANXIETY, PANIC ATTACKS, DEPRESSION, STRESS ETC AS EMOTIONAL HEALTH CONDITIONS AND (II) FOR THE INTRODUCTION OF 'SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL ASSISTANTS' WITHIN THE NHS/EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS WHO ARE EMPOWERED TO IDENTIFY AN INDIVIDUAL YOUNG PERSON'S HEALTH AND WELLBEING NEEDS AND PROVIDE THE RELEVANT SUPPORT AND TO IDENTIFY THOSE THAT ARE IN NEED OF URGENT MEDICAL INTERVENTION. C) CREATING A FORUM/HELPLINE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT GETTING HELP OR ARE RELUCTANT TO BECAUSE OF FEAR, STIGMA AND CATEGORISATION OF MENTAL HEALTH BEING AGAINST THEM BY SOCIETY WHEN SEEKING EMPLOYMENT ETC. D) INVOLVING FRIENDS AND FAMILY IN THE SUPPORT AND WELLBEING OF YOUNG PEOPLE THAT ARE GOING THROUGH MENTAL/EMOTIONAL CRISIS. E) CREATING AND USING A DVD TO ENCOURAGE YOUNG PEOPLE TO BE MORE OPEN ABOUT THEIR SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH. THIS WOULD BE A TOOL TO EXPLAIN HOW DEPRESSION, SOCIAL ISOLATION, ANXIETY ETC CAN FEEL AND ENCOURAGE YOUNG PEOPLE TO OPEN UP ABOUT HOW THEY ARE AND TALK ABOUT THE ISSUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
J ROMANI LTD
SUNNYBANK FARM
WHITEHALL ROAD EAST
BIRKENSHAW
BRADFORD
BD11 2LL
- Phone:
- 07971829990
- Email:
- j.romani@btopenworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window