Accounts and annual returns LIONESS LIONS CLUB OF EAST ANGLIA (CIO)

Charity number: 1180307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 June 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 03 May 2022 733 days late Download Open in new window