Accounts and annual returns PAKISTANI COMMUNITY CENTRE (LONGSIGHT)

Charity number: 512410
Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 41 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 41 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 February 2023 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 December 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 June 2021 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 December 2020 405 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required