Financial history PAKISTANI COMMUNITY CENTRE (LONGSIGHT)

Charity number: 512410
Charity reporting is up to date (98 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £17.46k £15.58k £13.58k £10.81k £11.66k
Total expenditure £11.05k £10.58k £10.58k £7.23k £9.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A