Trustees ST. GEORGE INDIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH LEICESTER
Charity number: 1181487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josen John | Chair | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Koodanparampil Mani Abraham | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariamma Jacob | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ninan John | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anil Puliparambil Verghese | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jain Meperathu Varghese | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Soji Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Binu Oonnunni John | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mebin Johnson Mathew | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgy Vathiattu Paul | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wilson Benny | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
SIJI JOY | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.