Accounts and annual returns THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD THE LIGHTHOUSE PARISH, BURY

Charity number: 1180471
Charity reporting is overdue by 143 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 143 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 143 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 December 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2021 355 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required