THE MALAWI SCHOOLS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education of children and young people living in the Mpasa district of Southern Malawi or such other districts of Malawi as the trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Malawi
Governance
- 02 August 2018: Standard registration
- MSP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AVERIL SESSIONS | Chair | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MELANIE EDGE | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|||||
JEFFREY FEAKINS | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE CUNNINGHAM | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA JOYCE MORGAN | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE MARY FEAKINS | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50k | £7.16k | £17.86k | £9.27k | £9.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.71k | £6.04k | £8.59k | £13.34k | £13.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECT') IS: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE MPASA DISTRICT OF SOUTHERN MALAWI OR SUCH OTHER DISTRICTS OF MALAWI AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) PAYING FOR SCHOOL, COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY FEES, UNIFORMS, EXERCISE BOOKS, BOOKS, PENS AND OTHER NECESSITIES TO ENABLE CHILDREN TO GO TO SCHOOL OR FURTHER EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS. (II) ERECTING NEW SCHOOL BUILDINGS, ESPECIALLY CLASSROOMS, IN SCHOOLS WHERE THE NUMBER OF PUPILS EXCEEDS THE SCHOOL'S ABILITY TO ACCOMMODATE THEM. (III) REPAIRING DILAPIDATED SCHOOL BUILDINGS, WHERE THE DILAPIDATIONS AFFECT THE CHILDREN'S ABILITY TO LEARN OR THE SCHOOL'S ABILITY TO USE THE BUILDINGS YEAR-ROUND. (IV) FUNDING SCHEMES TO ENCOURAGE CHILDREN TO ATTEND SCHOOL AND TO EDUCATE THEIR PARENTS IN THE IMPORTANCE OF EDUCATION. (V) SUPPORTING THE WORK OF EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, IN PARTICULAR PRIMARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOLS, FOR EXAMPLE THROUGH TEACHER TRAINING, THE INTRODUCTION OF CHILDREN'S READING PROGRAMMES, THE PROVISION OF BOOKS, LIBRARIES AND OTHER LEARNING TOOLS AND OF EXTRA TUITION FOR SELECTED CHILDREN. (VI) PROVIDING GIRLS WITH ADVICE AND MATERIALS FOR THE MANAGEMENT OF FEMININE HYGIENE; AND HELPING THEM WHERE NECESSARY WITH TRANSPORT AND ACCOMMODATION TO ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND SCHOOL. (VII) PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY TEACHING, SEMINARS, WORKSHOPS AND OTHER MEANS INTENDED TO FOSTER THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Maltings
Church Street
STEYNING
West Sussex
BN44 3YB
- Phone:
- 07947306256
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window