ST IVES (CORNWALL) ARTS CLUB SOCIETY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The display and sale of artwork in its many forms, the hosting of live performances ( theatre, poetry, cinema, music,) and talks , demonstrations, workshops, relating to the UK art scene but often specialising in Cornwall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 12 March 2019: CIO registration
- 18 February 2021: Funds received from 1001193 ST IVES (CORNWALL) ARTS CLUB SOCIETY
- ST IVES ART CLUB (Working name)
- THE ARTS CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Gee | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Richards | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Axten | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
stephen litherland | Trustee | 05 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £56.45k | £19.50k | £71.38k | £78.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £14.48k | £22.43k | £77.82k | £67.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.84k | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AN APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES, CONCERTS, RECITALS AND EXHIBITIONS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Ives (Cornwall) Arts Club Socie
Westcotts Quay
ST. IVES
TR26 2DY
- Phone:
- 01736799320
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window