HUDDERSFIELD GRAMMER SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support to school via fundraising activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Kirklees
Governance
- 26 April 1982: Standard registration
- 09 June 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- HGSPA (Working name)
- ST DAVID'S SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.85k | £3.08k | £2.21k | £2.95k | £4.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.15k | £2.25k | £1.93k | £1.82k | £2.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 DECEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED 31 OCTOBER 1985 AND 2 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY:(A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT OF THE SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window