MEDWAY AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1179545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We run a weekly drop in for senior citizens. We hold an annual young Black achievers awards. We develop and deliver projects that promote diversity and celebrate heritage and culture. We work with partners across statutory, voluntary, private sectors to achieve our objectives. We work with young people with regards to culture, arts and education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £101,428
Total expenditure: £78,826

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 August 2018: CIO registration
  • 29 May 2020: Funds received from 1148026 MEDWAY AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MACA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Carol Stewart Chair 15 June 2018
None on record
Andrew Leslie Trustee 07 August 2024
None on record
Lady Ima Ama Jane Brown Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
Carol Valentine Trustee 20 November 2020
None on record
Wendell Henry Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record
PATRICIA COOPER Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record
Amanda Halpin Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record
Patricia Gayle Trustee 15 June 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.66k £85.00k £141.00k £54.18k £101.43k
Total expenditure £12.86k £76.00k £94.00k £75.49k £78.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.22k £17.40k £36.00k £2.00k £25.05k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE SUNLIGHT DEVELOPMENT CENTRE
105 RICHMOND RD
GILLINGHAM
KENT
ME7 1LX
Phone:
08448849502