Accounts and annual returns YOUTH LYNKS

Charity number: 1179546
Charity reporting is overdue by 17 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 17 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 17 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 July 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 July 2023 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 July 2023 386 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 July 2023 386 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 October 2021 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 07 October 2021 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window