THE ALBRIGHT WOOD NORTON ESTATE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1182491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity owns and operates woodland at Wood Norton Evesham. The objects of the charity are: To promote for the benefit of the public the conservation,protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment by re-establishing trees,plants and wildlife. The woodland is available to voluntary groups to benefit from the woodland environment with the permission of the Trustees.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £51,698
Total expenditure: £47,123

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 March 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE ALBRIGHT WOOD NORTON CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HILARY ANNE ALBRIGHT Chair 21 December 2017
None on record
WILLIAM GORDON BAILEY Trustee 21 December 2017
None on record
BOB IAN BAILEY Trustee 21 December 2017
2ND EVESHAM BENGEWORTH SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Andrew Thomas Woods Trustee 21 December 2017
OMBERSLEY CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £581.95k £92.70k £52.60k £49.25k £51.70k
Total expenditure £26.05k £47.16k £55.18k £51.11k £47.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £572.45k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.54k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £7.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £20.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.09k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.61k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £5.09k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 24 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 24 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 08 June 2023 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 08 June 2023 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 28 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SPARROWS NEST
WOOD NORTON
EVESHAM
WR11 4TE
Phone:
07836204417
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available